THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DUNSTABLE

Charity Number: 1130250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching of Christianity Taking of assemblies in schools The provision of a youth club with a Christian ethos Promoting the mission of the church through the provision of activities for senior citizens parents and toddlers and other special needs groups Supporting other charities in the UK.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £373,009
Total expenditure: £300,666

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Central Bedfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • DUNSTABLE PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Rachel Susan Phillips Chair 31 October 2019
ASHTON SCHOOLS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE DUNSTABLE PRIORY PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
Veronica Yates Trustee 03 March 2024
DUNSTABLE MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY ("DMTC")
Received: On time
Nicola Jean Kershaw Trustee 03 March 2024
None on record
CHRISTOPHER YOUNG Trustee 03 March 2024
DUNSTABLE MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY ("DMTC")
Received: On time
Kate Melanie Klimaytys Trustee 21 June 2023
None on record
Jamie Arthur Murray Trustee 12 March 2023
None on record
Keith Richard King Trustee 20 March 2022
None on record
Judith Mary Read Trustee 11 October 2021
None on record
Shauna DYKE Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
GILLIAN MARY SHORT Trustee 18 October 2020
3RD DUNSTABLE ST PETER'S SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
THE DUNSTABLE PRIORY PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
JOHN BRADLEY Trustee 18 October 2020
THE DUNSTABLE PRIORY PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
Rosemary TURLEY Trustee 07 July 2020
None on record
Janet Morton Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Jacqueline Estella Prince Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Rev Tim DAVIS Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
REV Ricky Ronald Turner Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Keren Louvain Bonner Trustee 24 April 2017
None on record
Pamela Ingram Trustee 24 April 2017
None on record
GEORGINA MARY WEST Trustee
None on record
JUDITH DIANA PARLBY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £251.29k £214.71k £324.55k £259.35k £373.01k
Total expenditure £298.00k £284.33k £319.20k £287.46k £300.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £18.69k £1.00k £576

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 27 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 27 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 20 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Parish Church Hall
Church Street
DUNSTABLE
Bedfordshire
LU5 4RU
Phone:
01585477401