THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BATTERSEA FIELDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Pastoral work including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching Christianity through sermons and small groups. The provision of a youth club with a Christian ethos. Taking of religious assemblies in schools. Promoting the whole mission of the church through the provision of activities for all age groups. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 30 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST. SAVIOUR'S, ST. GEORGE'S AND ALL SAINTS, BATTERSEA FIELDS (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev LEIGHTON CARR | Chair | 14 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
XAVERINE VALENTINE | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
HELEN WINIFRED TROUT | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA MILINIAS | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
HELEN BULUSAN | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN MACKLIN | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE FADDIPE | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH CLARKE | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
ABEEDA LORNA ALVARANGA | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
CLARA MANLY-SPAIN | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH OBI | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD TROUT | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHANNA CLARKE | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
WENDY ORR | Trustee | 02 April 2000 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA TRUSTY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEDFORD CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Vasantha Gnanadoss | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.11k | £192.78k | £181.45k | £195.90k | £164.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £186.75k | £189.12k | £175.03k | £203.52k | £253.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BATTERSEA FIELDS PARISH
ST SAVIOUR CHURCH OFFICE
351 BATTERSEA PARK ROAD
LONDON
SW11 4LH
- Phone:
- +4420 7720 9076
- Email:
- office@batterseafields.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window