CENTRE FOR ACCESS TO FOOTBALL IN EUROPE (CAFE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides access and disability guidance to football clubs, associations and UEFA and works to create a more inclusive matchday experience and improved access to stadiums. In addition, works with local NGOs and disabled spectator groups to help support self-advocacy and sustainability. Aims to increase the number of disabled people attending live football matches across Europe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Albania
- Andorra
- Armenia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Bulgaria
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Estonia
- Faroe Islands
- Finland
- France
- Georgia
- Germany
- Greece
- Hungary
- Iceland
- Ireland
- Israel
- Italy
- Kazakhstan
- Latvia
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macedonia
- Malta
- Moldova
- Montenegro
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Russia
- San Marino
- Scotland
- Serbia
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Turkey
- Ukraine
Governance
- 25 August 2009: Standard registration
- ACCESSIBALL (Working name)
- CAFE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK ALEXANDER FLEWITT | Chair | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Daan de Jong | Trustee | 08 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOANA ISABEL DA COSTA E CAL | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dmytro Zharyi | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Roberts | Trustee | 12 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kush Kanodia | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £493.82k | £811.53k | £531.78k | £550.70k | £455.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £690.82k | £623.87k | £722.72k | £771.17k | £440.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £748.93k | £523.80k | £550.70k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £62.61k | £7.97k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £623.87k | £722.72k | £771.17k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £0 | £3.05k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 06 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DISABLED PEOPLE BY PROMOTING IMPORVED ACCESS AND FACILITIES FOR THEM AS FOOTBALL SPECTATORS, AND BY ENCOURAGING AND ASSISTING THE FORMATION OF ASSOCIATIONS OF PEOPLE TO FURTHER SUCH PURPOSES, ALL IN TERRITORIES OUTSIDE OF ENGLAND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION ACROSS EUROPE AND THE UNION OF EUROPEAN FOOTBALL ASSOCIATIONS (UEFA).
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite LP54557
20-22 Wenlock Road
LONDON
N1 7GU
- Phone:
- +44(0)203 355 9867
- Email:
- info@cafefootball.eu
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window