THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE, CATFORD

Charity number: 1131092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £357,925
Total expenditure: £342,562

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lewisham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
  • 07 June 2017: Funds received from 303153 ST LAURENCE YOUTH CENTRE
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST LAURENCE CATFORD PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Corinne Browne-Marke Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Alice Prince-Gilbert Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Leanne Harvey-Thompson Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Elaine Dixon Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Jennifer Thorne Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Lesley Ihekuna Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Paul Omondiale Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Raymond Williams Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Marva Mayne Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Joan Baker Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Beverley Chin Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Florence Browne-Marke Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
BRIDGIT SAM-BAILEY Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
Victor Obasogie Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
Joyce Turpin Trustee 27 April 2014
None on record
GRACE BLYTH Trustee 25 April 1989
LEWISHAM CHURCHES CARE
Received: 12 days late
LEWISHAM PENSIONERS FORUM
Received: On time
Canon CHARLES PICKSTONE Trustee
LADY PEEL LEGACY TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 266 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £260.46k £253.96k £294.79k £318.13k £357.93k
Total expenditure £237.15k £256.49k £291.43k £331.94k £342.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.26k N/A £20.00k £50 £5.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 19 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 19 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 01 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 23 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
37 BROMLEY ROAD
LONDON
SE6 2TS
Phone:
02086989706