TAUNTON DEANE AND SOUTH SEDGEMOOR METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1133126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The activities of the circuit are set within the context of the Methodist Church Connexional policy of Our Calling.The church exists: to increase awareness of God's presence and to celebrate God's love; to to help people to grow and to learn as Christians through mutual support and care;to be a good neighbour to people in need and to challenge injustice;and to make more followers of Jesus Christ.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £138,602
Total expenditure: £160,538

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 December 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

32 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Annie Deche Trustee 25 November 2024
None on record
Elaine Banks Trustee 25 November 2024
None on record
Ann Jordon Trustee 25 November 2024
None on record
Christopher Mitchell Trustee 25 November 2024
None on record
Rev Robin Hutt Trustee 25 November 2024
None on record
Hazel Jordon Trustee 25 November 2024
None on record
Michelle Noble Trustee 12 October 2023
None on record
Merlyn Brown Trustee 18 March 2021
None on record
Ian Rossiter Trustee 18 March 2021
TEMPLE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Carol Stowe Trustee 18 March 2021
None on record
Francis Lewis Trustee 18 March 2021
None on record
Rev Peter Thomas Trustee 18 March 2021
None on record
CHRISTOPHER DOWNING Trustee 18 March 2021
None on record
Denise Jean Eggington Trustee 01 September 2017
SOMERSPIRIT
Received: On time
ROY CROUCH Trustee 14 September 2015
None on record
Janet Sillett Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
KEVIN BOSELEY Trustee 29 November 2013
None on record
MARGARET WALTERS Trustee 10 June 2013
None on record
REV TONY COX Trustee 25 January 2012
None on record
RICHARD SILLETT Trustee 20 July 2011
BISHOPS LYDEARD VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD
Received: On time
Rev DEBORAH MARY KIRK Trustee 20 June 2011
South West Peninsula Methodist District
Received: On time
WORK-WISE
Received: On time
TEMPLE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
MR GRAHAM DICKINSON Trustee
WORK-WISE
Received: On time
TEMPLE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
JOANNE MARY PINGUENET Trustee
TRINITY SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
LYNDA PRIMROSE SPURRETT KAZER Trustee
TEMPLE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
MS JANE ALLIN Trustee
THE NEW ROOM/JOHN WESLEY'S CHAPEL
Received: On time
MUSGROVE LEUKAEMIC GROUP SOMERSET
Received: On time
MERLYN RONALD BROWN CERT. ED. Trustee
None on record
VALERIE ANNE PEARSON Trustee
None on record
ELAINE ANNE DEW M.ED. Trustee
None on record
MARLENE ANN BURNELL Trustee
None on record
BARBARA EILEEN POOLE Trustee
None on record
GLENYS HARRIET ELIZABETH ALLINSON BA Trustee
None on record
DAVID ALAN CLITHEROE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £141.16k £152.76k £139.25k £135.24k £138.60k
Total expenditure £153.24k £152.25k £138.67k £144.48k £160.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 20 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 26 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 26 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 15 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 15 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 01 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 19 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
36 Craig Lea
TAUNTON
Somerset
TA2 7SY
Phone:
01823344854