Cove Parochial Church Council

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities through regular weekly worship services, weekday opportunities to learn about the Christian faith, on-line recordings and website. Community outreach particularly focussed on those in need. This includes Farnborough Foodbank, those experiencing social isolation, loneliness and seasonal warm space. Farnborough Foodbank is a franchise of The Trussell Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

18 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 21 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 10 April 2025: Funds received from 1143212 FARNBOROUGH FOODBANK
- PCC OF COVE PARISH (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN COVE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Gemma Michelle Foster | Chair | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Christine Caney | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marc Ogwen Roberts | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann Bird | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Whitlock | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jane George | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean Margaret Williams | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Anne Richardson | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Philip Richardson | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Jane Pidd | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Beadle | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Charles Taylor | Trustee | 11 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Susan Brown | Trustee | 11 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jonathan Hyde | Trustee | 11 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Pyatt | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR TONY BEADLE | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS YOUNG | Trustee | 09 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS JACQUIE SNUGGS | Trustee | 01 May 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £204.46k | £226.61k | £227.34k | £240.58k | £303.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.85k | £237.75k | £199.93k | £247.81k | £274.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 December 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 December 2024 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES as amended on 04 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christ Church
Cove Road
FARNBOROUGH
Hampshire
GU14 0EX
- Phone:
- 01252 371804
- Email:
- INFO@COVEPARISH.CHURCH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window