THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANN, MANCHESTER

Charity number: 1136159
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote the whole mission of the Church in the city centre of Manchester. To enable adults and children to come to faith and live a full life. To maintain and make available the parish church for the use of the community, in particular to allow a place of quiet and prayer, to maintain an historic place of worship, to support people in need and to promote appropriate music.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £167,465
Total expenditure: £272,392

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 June 2010: Previously excepted registration
  • 28 July 2020: Funds received from 526429 THE MANCHESTER, SAINT ANN'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST ANN'S PCC, MANCHESTER (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Mark Lacy Trustee 15 June 2023
None on record
Helen Lacy Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Sarah Edwina Mary Johnston Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Dr James Cameron Hume Trustee 04 October 2020
None on record
Martin Gregson Trustee 04 October 2020
None on record
Andrew Moore Kyle Trustee 04 October 2020
KANTOS CHAMBER CHOIR
Received: On time
MANCHESTER CHAMBER CONCERTS SOCIETY
Received: On time
Michael Christopher Johnson Trustee 04 October 2020
None on record
Stacy Angela Fox Trustee 14 April 2019
None on record
KEN HALLIWELL Trustee 24 April 2016
None on record
JENNIFER JANE FREW Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £169.34k £130.51k £137.73k £160.68k £167.47k
Total expenditure £181.44k £91.76k £146.34k £155.64k £272.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.02k £19.59k N/A £1.55k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. ANNS CHURCH
ST. ANN STREET
MANCHESTER
M2 7LF
Phone:
01618340239