Trustees CLITHEROE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1133020
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev IAN HUMPHREYS | Chair | 28 September 2012 |
|
|||||
Peter James Dixon | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Holden | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Hughes | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kathryn Ann Marie Flynn | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Norman John Pedley | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Lumsden | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Christine Britcliffe | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Calvert | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Roy Porter | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ian Darbyshire | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Emma Woodhouse | Trustee | 21 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
IRENE ELIZABETH PARSONS | Trustee | 21 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR STEUART HAROLD KELLINGTON | Trustee | 21 January 2016 |
|
|||||
ROBIN SCAPPATICCI LLB ACMA | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|||||
MARGARET JACKSON | Trustee | 28 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN CRANE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOROTHY HEATHER HOWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GWENDOLINE ANNE BRIDGEMAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN GARNER BA | Trustee |
|
||||||
Christine Ellen Beggs | Trustee |
|
||||||
BEVERLEY JONES | Trustee |
|
||||||
STELLA ROSTHORN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER HOWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW HINCHLIFFE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET ELIZABETH BRAITHWAITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN COLES RGN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.