Winchester Eastleigh and Romsey Methodist Circuit

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WINCHESTER,EASTLEIGH AND ROMSEY METHODIST CIRCUIT EXISTS TO UPHOLD AND MAINTAIN THE WORK OF THE METHODIST CHURCH OF GREAT BRITAIN IN WINCHESTER, EASTLEIGH AND ROMSEY (HAMPSHIRE) AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

48 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 08 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 11 September 2013: Funds received from 1142722 WINCHESTER METHODIST CIRCUIT
- EASTLEIGH METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- WINCHESTER AND EASTLEIGH METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
48 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Peter Gerrard Rayson | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Jane Evans | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew La Follette | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clever Safurawu | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Pearce | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Rose Goldsmith | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia-Anne Soares | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Grove | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
John Leslie Baden Pearce | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Peter Kenneth Ford | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Marie Jenkins | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Timothy Andrew Searle | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY CLIFFORD | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Ben MacLachlan | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Frederick Castle | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Hughes | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Grace Parsons | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Patricia Penny | Trustee | 25 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
CATHRYN ANN SIMONS | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Eleanor Carter | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sarah McClelland | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Yarrien | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Atkinson | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
IRENE JEANETTE BOURNE | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Robert Hatch | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Thomas Bourne | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Don Simons | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jene Pelletier | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Eric John Renouf | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Pack | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hatch | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Revd Ruth Fry | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Robertson | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Margaret Fuest | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Brian Dennis Robinson | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Mole | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS JILL FORD | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
SAMUEL JAMES BARNES DIPHE. | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR STEVE JENKINS | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARK VIVIAN DOWNER ACIB | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Ackroyd | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
DEREK LOWE | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|||||
MR CHRIS GOODHEAD | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|||||
Rev Kate Elizabeth Cambridge | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jean Britton | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ROGERS | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANE PADLEY NNEB | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £433.64k | £425.86k | £468.99k | £453.59k | £460.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £425.35k | £424.83k | £407.75k | £443.66k | £427.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 20 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/11/2009 AS AMENDED ON 28/11/2012 as amended on 14 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHANDLERS FORD METHODIST CHURCH
WINCHESTER ROAD
CHANDLER'S FORD
EASTLEIGH
SO53 2GJ
- Phone:
- 02380 260128
- Website:
-
wermethodistcircuit.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window