MID CHESHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

49 Trustee(s)
400 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 18 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- NORTHWICH AND WINSFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
49 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Christine Aspey | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Allen Moyo | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Kathryn Patricia Craig | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
David Frith | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Mike Hornby | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Avril Bastin | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Robert Woodcock | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Ellenor Mabel Wilkinson | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
April Wilkinson | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Cathy Walmsley | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||||||
Mike Wells | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Rosemary Gilbert | Trustee | 31 August 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Nick Hearnshaw | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Sylvia Newman | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Gillian Holden | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Rachel Gilbert-Bratt | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Michael Arthur Fellows | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
JOHN HULME | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||||||
Pauline Walker | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Margaret Done | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Olwen Dutton | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
rosemary head | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
PETER JOHN CRAVEN | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
ROY ALEC CRAIG | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
irene may collie | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
ian trevor jones | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
LINDA RUTH REEVE | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
slyvia richardson | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
olwyn whittaker | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
michael wesley newman | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
lynne cieka | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
susan jane treeton | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
christine sara kirkham | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
IDA EYRES | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
pauline hesketh robbins | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
janet susan wardle | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
MERVYN WILKINSON BOUGHEY | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
MARGARET MARY SOUTAR | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|||||||||
JOHN JEREMY COLLIER FREEMAN | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|||||||||
katherine mary tunnicliffe | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
helen pauline williams | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
terence stanley hinton | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
john lomas | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
PAUL BAILEY | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
roger trevor jones | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Gary Cliffe | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
REV PAT BILLSBORROW | Trustee | 09 April 2012 |
|
|||||||||
Maureen Ashton | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||||||
David Martin Whitfield | Trustee | 01 September 1998 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £227.99k | £346.23k | £238.88k | £208.72k | £230.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £237.11k | £279.59k | £313.34k | £260.52k | £287.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2023
(These accounts |
17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 September 2020 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 10 September 2020 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 15 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Northwich Methodist Outreach Centre
Witton Street
Northwich
CW9 5LP
- Phone:
- 01606350764
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window