Mid Cornwall Circuit, The Methodist Church

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Governance of 14 churches in the Mid Cornwall Circuit of the Methodist Church in line with the Standing Orders of the Methodist Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£2,060,030
Donations and legacies | £1.09k | |
Charitable activities | £34.46k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £11.75k | |
Other | £2.01m |
Total expenditure:
£525,869
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other | £525.87k |
£409,449 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £16,200 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £525.87k | |
Charitable expenditure | £0 | |
Retained for future use | £1.53m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £525.87k | |
Charitable expenditure | £0 | |
Retained for future use | £1.94m |
People

10 Employee(s)
58 Trustee(s)
210 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 17 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 29 September 2022: Funds received from 1139481 NEWQUAY PERRANPORTH & ST AGNES METHODIST CIRCUIT
- TRURO CIRCUIT, THE METHODIST CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
58 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Lynn Armstrong | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Sue Jackson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Clifford Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Julie Anne Thomas | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Thomas | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Clare Judith Anderson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Christine Roberts | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Christine Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev DEREK JOHN COLLINS | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Janet Louise Crocker | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Philip Adrian Booth | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Angela Faye Solway | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Stephen William Harris | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Ronald James Cartwright | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Marion Violet Caldwell | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Simon John Clarke | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Ian Rex Street | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Victoria Helen Hartnell | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Jessica Prudence Rush | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Karen Potts | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Helen Jayne Thomas | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Malcolm Corbet Kingston | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Adrian Mitchell | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Helen Nicholson | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Victoria Kathleen Hick | Trustee | 29 August 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Linda Baines | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Graham Baines | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
LINDA RICHARDS | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Susan Mary Strawford | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Stephen Nicholson | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
PETER KEAST | Trustee | 26 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev MARGARET BARNES | Trustee | 26 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
ALISON CURRY | Trustee | 26 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
ELSIE THOMAS | Trustee | 26 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
PHILIP DAVEY | Trustee | 26 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Alison Murfin | Trustee | 26 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
ANGELA RICHARDS | Trustee | 26 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
DIANE TAYLOR | Trustee | 26 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
DENISE DEIGHTON | Trustee | 26 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Ernest Dymond | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Kenneth Claude Yeo | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|||||||||
DAVID CROCKER | Trustee | 25 April 2013 |
|
|||||||||
Heather Jane Rounsevell | Trustee | 01 September 2009 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Aubin De Gruchy | Trustee | 01 September 2002 |
|
|
||||||||
ROSS ROUSNSEVELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
DAVID ROBSHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
DAVID WILLIAM RABEY BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Rev JANET MYRA KNOWLES-BERRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Rita Soper | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
REV JJ JOHNSON PHD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
GILL HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MARY ADAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
BRIAN JOHN HAYWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
HILARY MURIEL NICHOLSON BSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Rev Mark Dunn-Wilson | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
JANET TREDREA | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
STEPHEN PAUL NICHOLSON | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
BARRIE TIPPETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £259.02k | £272.45k | £281.65k | £421.12k | £2.06m | |
|
Total expenditure | £288.26k | £282.85k | £291.11k | £450.53k | £525.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £762 | £16.20k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.09k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £34.46k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.75k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.01m | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £525.87k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.57m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.57k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £636.74k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £69.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) as amended on 01 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRURO METHODIST CHURCH
UNION PLACE
TRURO
TR1 1EP
- Phone:
- 07481299941
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window