GI TRUST

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
We fund Get Involved with African Street Children Organisation (GI ASCO), a Ugandan registered NGO which supports 21 former street children in the GI Asco house and the Assessment and Rehabilitation Centre and a further 17 children within the local community. In addition, GI ASCO operates a transition house for 11 boys over 18 years old who are still in education or training.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 05 April 2024
Pobl

4 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Cymorth Dramor/cymorth I’r Newynog
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Cyllid Arall
- Uganda
Llywodraethu
- 09 Awst 2010: Cofrestrwyd
Dim enwau eraill
- Buddiannau croes
- Rheoli risg
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
4 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIE MITCHELL | Ymddiriedolwr | 05 June 2011 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN MITCHELL | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
||||||||
ANNE MITCHELL | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
|
|||||||
WILL MITCHELL | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £38.53k | £18.64k | £17.47k | £11.03k | £3.07k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £39.42k | £22.46k | £18.01k | £9.79k | £6.10k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2024 | 10 Ionawr 2025 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2024 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2023 | 22 Ionawr 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2022 | 19 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2021 | 10 Ionawr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2020 | 12 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2020 | 12 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED MADE 28 JUNE 2010
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(I) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY: A. PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, AND/OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS, GROUPS OR PROJECTS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY; B. PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OR IMPROVEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING (INCLUDING VOCATIONAL TRAINING), HEALTHCARE, HOUSING AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS, PARTICULARLY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, TO BE SELF-SUFFICIENT; C. CO-OPERATING WITH AGENCIES, ORGANISATIONS AND GROUPS INTERESTED AND/OR IN PROJECTS, PROGRAMMES AND WORKS FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT; D. LOBBYING FOR RESOURCES TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY; E. ADVOCATING FOR THE RIGHTS OF THE POOR, NEEDY AND OPPRESSED. (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL, PHYSICAL AND NUTRITIONAL EDUCATION) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMIT, BY: A. AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES, SPONSORSHIP OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY PRIMARY OR SECONDARY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION; B. ASSISTING SUCH PERSONS TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT; C. ASSISTING (FINANCIALLY OR BY OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) ANY PRIMARY OR SECONDARY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION. (III) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR BY OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
53 STOKE LANE
WESTBURY-ON-TRYM
BRISTOL
BS9 3DW
- Ffôn:
- 01173776540
- E-bost:
- chris@gitrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window