UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH WALES/PRIFYSGOL DE CYMRU

Charity number: 1140312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The University provides education and training, and undertakes research for the public benefit

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 February 2011: Standard registration
  • 09 May 2014: Funds received from 1143715 UNIVERSITY OF WALES, NEWPORT
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • UNIVERSITY OF GLAMORGAN / PRIFYSGOL MORGANNWG (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LOUISE EVANS Chair 01 August 2017
MERTHYR TYDFIL COLLEGE LIMITED
Received: On time
ROYAL WELSH COLLEGE OF MUSIC AND DRAMA
Received: On time
Dr William James Paul Gravelle Trustee 10 February 2025
None on record
Ian Morgan Trustee 10 February 2025
None on record
Rachel Elias-Lee Trustee 10 February 2025
None on record
M Imam Hossain Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Jahid Hasan Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Sharon James Trustee 01 August 2023
None on record
Jonathan Jones Trustee 01 August 2023
None on record
Michael Hugo James Plaut OBE Trustee 01 August 2023
ROYAL WELSH COLLEGE OF MUSIC AND DRAMA
Received: On time
THE LADY TANGYE TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Geraint Evans Trustee 06 April 2023
None on record
Dr Ben Calvert Trustee 01 September 2021
MERTHYR TYDFIL COLLEGE LIMITED
Received: On time
ROYAL WELSH COLLEGE OF MUSIC AND DRAMA
Received: On time
Sion O'Connor Trustee 01 August 2021
FEEL WELL FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Sanjay Balakrishnan Trustee 04 June 2021
None on record
Stephen Wilson Trustee 19 April 2021
None on record
Richard Lloyd-Owen Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
David Francis Trustee 01 April 2021
ROYAL WELSH COLLEGE OF MUSIC AND DRAMA
Received: On time
ELUSEN HOCI CYMRU CHARITY
Recently registered
Professor Philip Gummett Trustee 09 March 2020
None on record
Debra Jones Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Alison Phillips Trustee 01 August 2017
None on record
Michael Stevens Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £198.94m £198.83m £200.21m £218.93m £233.03m
Total expenditure £193.89m £200.06m £195.00m £215.99m £231.82m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.53m £3.53m £3.37m £4.83m £5.37m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £4.59m £4.05m £4.75m £4.23m £3.45m
Income - Charitable activities £169.80m £175.97m £180.79m £196.32m £202.32m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.29m £1.26m £571.00k £521.00k £4.23m
Income - Other £23.27m £17.55m £14.11m £17.86m £23.03m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £193.89m £200.06m £195.00m £215.99m £231.82m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Own use assets £257.66m £251.10m £249.76m £249.19m £237.68m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £125.42m £135.11m £172.96m £206.64m £225.38m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£144.69m -£174.18m -£172.93m -£45.67m £0
Total liabilities £162.79m £157.33m £174.42m £188.69m £189.42m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 08 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 08 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 22 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 22 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 18 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 18 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 28 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 09 June 2020 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 09 June 2020 9 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH WALES
TREFOREST
PONTYPRIDD
CF37 1DL
Phone:
01443654171
Email:
No information available