LEGACY WM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote wellbeing among diverse local communities through an understanding of their unique histories, cultures and of their shared role in shaping the West Midlands region. We aim to help communities develop a sense of shared neighbourhood and common purpose, using cultural heritage as a tool to tackle disadvantage, promote health / wellbeing and celebrate diversity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
- Sandwell
Governance
- 15 April 2011: Standard registration
- 15 March 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 15 March 2019: Funds transferred to 1180546 LEGACY WM
- LEGACY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2013 | 31/10/2014 | 31/10/2015 | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.67k | £63.01k | £132.80k | £193.26k | £174.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.47k | £37.01k | £81.87k | £179.68k | £163.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £9.00k | £1.00k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | 10 August 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | 10 August 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | 06 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | 06 April 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2015 | 07 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2015 | 20 July 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/09/2010 AS AMENDED ON 05/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 30/09/2013 AS AMENDED ON 06/01/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE CULTURE, ARTS, WELLBEING, HERITAGE AND SOCIAL HISTORY OF PEOPLE INCLUDING THOSE THAT ARE DISADVANTAGED FROM DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS IN THE WEST MIDLANDS AND GLOBALLY AND IN SO DOING PROMOTING THE COHESION BETWEEN AND WITHIN THE GROUPS.
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS AND GLOBALLY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window