ROCHDALE & LITTLEBOROUGH METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Circuit encourages the Churches to provide :- a/ sacred spaces (a building) for regular acts of worship, prayers and contemplation for church members and non members alike. b/ teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small gruops. c/ pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved. d youth and senior citizens clubs, womens and mens meetings etc with a christian ethos.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£647,570
Donations and legacies | £346 | |
Charitable activities | £181.64k | |
Other trading activities | £18.60k | |
Investments | £22.26k | |
Other | £424.73k |
Total expenditure:
£384,180
Raising funds | £162.63k | |
Charitable activities | £221.55k | |
Other | £0 |
£5,754 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £162.63k | |
Charitable expenditure | £221.55k | |
Retained for future use | £263.39k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £162.63k | |
Charitable expenditure | £221.55k | |
Retained for future use | £269.14k |
People

4 Employee(s)
50 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Rochdale
Governance
- 04 February 2011: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
50 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev RUTH JACKSON | Chair | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Rosamund Beal | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Greenwood | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLA HELLIWELL | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL EVES | Trustee | 21 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN Walton Bleackley | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Marcianne Uwimana | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Malnutt | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Peter Malnutt | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Varley | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ken Peden | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lesley Downing | Trustee | 04 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Mary Collinson | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Frankland | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janice Knott | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
RUTH MARY TUNNICLIFFE | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Steven Tunnicliffe | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Sanger | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jean Spencer | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Sanger | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Kerr | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neil Helliwell | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Ashworth | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CARSON | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Janet Bower | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pauline McKay | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Peden | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Whitaker | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
DILYS PEARSON | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
JANICE HICKS | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Simba Gomwe | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joan Burrows | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Copley | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Tattersall | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Leonie O'Donoghue | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Glennis Crossley | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS JACKIE WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MIKE BENNION | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV LAWRENCE COPLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JILL HAMNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SYLVIA MARY WILD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR LES BIRKETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEN GRIFFIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOAN TATTERSALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN ELIZABETH NIELSEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID WHEATLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN WASS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANE HARDWICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW HOWARD HARDWICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM STRATFORD BOOTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £226.25k | £234.24k | £221.18k | £194.43k | £647.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £238.48k | £213.93k | £240.01k | £328.47k | £384.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £346 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.60k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £181.64k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £22.26k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £424.73k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £221.55k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £162.63k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £41.70k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.56k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £151.78k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.13m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £651.75k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £34.27k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Whitfield Crescent
Newhey
ROCHDALE
Lancashire
OL16 4NA
- Phone:
- 01706378395
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window