THE FRANCIS CRICK INSTITUTE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Francis Crick Institute is dedicated to understanding the fundamental biology underlying health and disease. Our work is helping to understand why disease develops and to translate discoveries into new ways to prevent, diagnose and treat illnesses such as cancer, heart disease, stroke, infections and neurodegenerative diseases.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£231,227,374
Donations and legacies | £216.88m | |
Charitable activities | £2.04m | |
Other trading activities | £8.39m | |
Investments | £2.58m | |
Other | £1.34m |
Total expenditure:
£237,649,984
Raising funds | £1.56m | |
Charitable activities | £236.09m | |
Other | £0 |
£4,414,602 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £7,776,865 from 76 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.56m | |
Charitable expenditure | £236.09m |
People

1593 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 85 |
£70k to £80k | 39 |
£80k to £90k | 38 |
£90k to £100k | 31 |
£100k to £110k | 9 |
£110k to £120k | 11 |
£120k to £130k | 5 |
£130k to £140k | 5 |
£140k to £150k | 5 |
£150k to £200k | 17 |
£200k to £250k | 6 |
£250k to £300k | 4 |
£450k to £500k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 January 2011: Standard registration
- THE FRANCIS CRICK INSTITUTE (Working name)
- UKCMRI (Previous name)
- UKCMRI (UNITED KINGDOM CENTRE FOR MEDICAL RESEARCH AND INNOVATION) (Previous name)
- UKCMRI LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord Edmund John Phillip Browne | Chair | 01 August 2017 |
|
|||||
Michelle Elizabeth Mitchell | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Graham Michael Lord | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr John-Arne Rottingen | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Professor Patrick Francis Chinnery | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Geraint Ellis Rees | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Mary Patricia Ryan | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sir Adrian Peter Bird | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Isabelle Ealet | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Menelas Nicolas Pangalos | Trustee | 21 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Brian Gilvary | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Catherine Elizabeth BINGHAM | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.52m | £174.94m | £185.63m | £213.19m | £231.23m | |
|
Total expenditure | £189.06m | £188.00m | £197.38m | £210.29m | £237.65m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £2.09m | £1.25m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £53.63m | £52.51m | £68.30m | £268.00k | £7.78m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £160.73m | £165.70m | £170.38m | £201.49m | £216.88m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £3.45m | £4.81m | £6.97m | £8.39m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.04m | £4.31m | £4.05m | £2.64m | £2.04m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £1.00m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £150.00k | £1.28m | £993.74k | £1.76m | £2.58m | |
|
Income - Other | £606.00k | £198.40k | £5.39m | £332.00k | £1.34m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £189.02m | £187.76m | £196.85m | £209.11m | £236.09m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £42.00k | £245.25k | £531.24k | £1.18m | £1.56m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £522.00k | £602.64k | £665.56k | £695.00k | £1.08m | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £49.33m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £134.00k | £87.30k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £532.58m | £510.33m | £491.41m | £566.70m | £480.77m | |
|
Long-term investments | £28.14m | £34.65m | £80.88m | £2.34m | £93.83m | |
|
Other assets | £56.87m | £79.12m | £37.09m | £70.18m | £69.16m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £35.35m | £48.70m | £43.39m | £71.67m | £77.90m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/04/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/07/2012 as amended on 04 Dec 2015 as amended on 31 Jan 2019 as amended on 15 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HUMAN HEALTH AND EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION AND CARRYING OUT, DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, OF ALL ASPECTS OF BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH AND INNOVATION, WHICH SHALL INCLUDE IN PARTICULAR THE FOLLOWING: 1 ESTABLISHING, OPERATING AND MANAGING A CENTRE FOR MEDICAL RESEARCH AND INNOVATION; 2 ENGAGING IN, ENCOURAGING AND SUPPORTING: 2.1 RESEARCH INTO ANY OF THE BIOSCIENCES; 2.2 THE DISCOVERY, INVENTION, IMPROVEMENT, DEVELOPMENT AND APPLICATION OF PREVENTIONS, TREATMENTS, CURES, DIAGNOSTICS AND OTHER MEDICAL AGENTS, METHODS AND PROCESSES THAT MAY IN ANY WAY PREVENT OR RELIEVE ILLNESS, DISEASE, DISABILITY OR DISORDERS OF WHATEVER NATURE (INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, ALL FORMS OF CANCER); AND 3 DEVELOPING AND TRAINING SCIENTISTS AND SUPPORTING BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH ENDEAVOURS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Francis Crick Institute
1 Midland Road
London
NW1 1AT
- Phone:
- 02037960000
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window