SOUTHPORT @NORTHWEST MACULAR SUPPORT GROUP

Charity Number: 1142183
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Help desk every Thursday 10am to 12am & 1pm to 3pm at the one stop shop Southport Group meetings twice a month 2 & 4 Tuesday in the mouth at Lord street west Southport also a help desk at Bootle one stop shop .we take our members on day out.we give them advice and support information and support .

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015

Total income: £8,220
Total expenditure: £8,188

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bury
  • Knowsley
  • Lancashire
  • Liverpool City
  • Sefton
  • St Helens
  • Wigan
  • Wirral

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 June 2011: Standard registration
  • 10 May 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 10 May 2016: Funds transferred to 526088 GALLOWAY'S SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £5.40k £7.86k £8.48k £8.22k
Total expenditure £7.08k £7.42k £7.86k £8.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 14 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 31 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 27 September 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required