THE MASTER AND FELLOWS OF THE COLLEGE OF THE GREAT HALL OF THE UNIVERSITY COMMONLY CALLED UNIVERSITY COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1141259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of university education, learning, and research within the collegiate structure of the University of Oxford.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 April 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • UNIVERSITY COLLEGE, OXFORD (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

55 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FELICE GEORGINA BINGHAM NASSAR Trustee 18 September 2023
None on record
BEAU MADISON MOUNT Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Natalya Vince Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
ANEURIN JOHN CYNAN ELLIS-EVANS Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Dr NICHOLAS PETER TALBOT Trustee 20 October 2021
None on record
Professor BARTOSZ KLIN Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Dr Niclas Moneke Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
The Rt Hon the Baroness Valerie Ann Amos Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Dr Marina Rucsandra Filip Trustee 17 February 2020
None on record
Dr James Bryson Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Professor Tian Yuan Tan Trustee 23 October 2019
None on record
Dr Rajendra Anand Chitnis Trustee 23 October 2019
None on record
Dr Maren Schentuleit Trustee 23 October 2019
None on record
Professor Adam Smith Trustee 23 October 2019
None on record
Professor Rosalind Rickaby Trustee 23 October 2019
None on record
Dr Richard Ashdowne Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Dr JOSEPH ELIEZER SALKIE MOSHENSKA Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Professor Gavin Screaton Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Dr Andrew Ian Grant Trustee 01 August 2017
THE UNIV. OLD MEMBERS' TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Patrick Rebeschini Trustee 01 August 2017
None on record
Dr SOPHIE MCGREGOR SMITH Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record
Dr INE JACOBS Trustee 04 May 2016
None on record
Dr MICHAEL A BARNES Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
CAROLINE EJ TERQUEM Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
Dr ANDREW BELL Trustee 22 September 2015
None on record
SQUADRON LEADER ANGELA UNSWORTH Trustee 01 August 2015
None on record
Dr NIKOLAY NIKOLOV Trustee 15 March 2013
None on record
Dr POLLY JONES Trustee 15 March 2013
None on record
JACOB ROWBOTTOM Trustee 15 March 2013
None on record
Dr MARTIN GALPIN Trustee 15 March 2013
None on record
Dr JUSTIN BENESCH Trustee 15 March 2013
None on record
Dr CLARE LEAVER Trustee 15 March 2013
None on record
MARTIN SMITH Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record
Dr SOPHOCLES MAVROEIDIS Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record
Dr ANDREW KER Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record
EDMAN TSANG Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record
BILL CHILD Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record
JOTUN HEIN Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record
PETER HOWELL Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record
GIDEON HENDERSON Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record
NICHOLAS YEUNG Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record
Professor THOMAS POVEY Trustee 07 April 2011
A C IRVINE TRAVEL FUND ICW OXFORD UNIVERSITY
Received: On time
NICHOLAS HALMI Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record
CATHERINE HOLMES Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record
DAVID LOGAN Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record
MICHAEL BENEDIKT Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record
PETER JEZZARD Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record
TREVOR SHARP Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record
CATHERINE PEARS Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record
JOHN WHEATER Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record
BENJAMIN JACKSON Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record
ANGUS JOHNSTON Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR NGAIRE WOODS Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record
Rev ANDREW GREGORY Trustee 07 April 2011
None on record
WILLIAM ALLAN ALLAN Trustee 31 March 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £15.38m £21.01m £18.27m £21.10m £17.76m
Total expenditure £16.84m £15.55m £15.71m £16.31m £16.29m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £3.43m £3.52m
Income from government grants £1.73m £3.32m £3.29m £3.43m N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.73m £9.93m £8.38m £10.41m £3.67m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £6.98m £5.78m £5.54m £7.59m £8.29m
Income - Endowments £1.75m £888.00k £863.00k £2.05m £703.00k
Income - Investment £6.38m £5.74m £4.89m £4.99m £6.48m
Income - Other £39.00k £450.00k £317.00k £168.00k £26.00k
Income - Legacies £44.50k £6.52m £100 £135.00k £205.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £13.02m £11.81m £11.86m £12.50m £12.84m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.34m £2.26m £2.37m £2.33m £1.97m
Expenditure - Governance £120.00k £123.00k £126.00k £132.00k £164.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £1.09m £1.36m £1.47m £1.17m £1.07m
Expenditure - Other £1.48m £1.48m £1.48m £1.48m £1.48m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Own use assets £59.77m £60.93m £52.26m £59.71m £64.74m
Long-term investments £200.86m £188.56m £205.23m £206.89m £208.63m
Other assets £7.04m £14.14m £21.87m £31.01m £28.39m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£3.23m -£2.31m -£2.03m -£3.61m -£2.73m
Total liabilities £52.78m £52.27m £51.79m £56.60m £60.53m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 28 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 28 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 26 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 26 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 26 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 26 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 28 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 17 June 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 17 June 2020 17 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
UNIVERSITY COLLEGE
HIGH STREET
OXFORD
OX1 4BH
Phone:
01865276602