BRIGHT FUTURES OXFORDSHIRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Presently inactive. Intention to promote social activity in the area of West Oxfordshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £16,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 27 July 2011: Standard registration
- BURWELL HALL COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- TWO FOURTEEN (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Jonathan Meathrel | Chair | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jason John Huffadine | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra June COLEMAN | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|||||
John Benjamin Stephen Gridley | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £150 | £16.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £150 | £3.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 MAR 2018 as amended on 17 May 2018
Charitable objects
…to further or benefit the residents of West Oxfordshire and elsewhere in the UK, in accordance with Christian values, through: 1) the promotion of community welfare, social cohesion and inclusion 2) the prevention or relief of poverty and hardship 3) the advancement of education of the public 4) the advancement of such other purposes as are charitable in accordance with English law so as to make a difference to those in need in the sphere of operation
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Nourse Close
Leckhampton
Cheltenham
gl53 0nq
- Phone:
- 01608646127
- Email:
- PAULM@rootsandrivers.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window