VERWOOD PRIZE BAND (VERWOOD CONCERT BRASS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Musical advancement of members through a band structure set up to develop and support players of any age from beginners through to professional standard. Musical entertainment through concerts and performances. Participation and promotion of musical activities though contests and concerts. Raising money for other charities through collections and provision of entertainment at fund raising events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £50,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 11 October 2011: Standard registration
- 06 February 2023: Funds received from 295369 AGE CONCERN VERWOOD
- VERWOOD CONCERT BRASS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN DUNNINGS | Chair | 23 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rosanna Connell | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian Harris | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Tanner | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Gwyneth Selby | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Lock | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Smith | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Adams | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Louisa Elliott | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sian Mete | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Burrows | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ward | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
SALLY BURROWS | Trustee | 23 July 2011 |
|
|||||
ROBERT STEVEN GRAVES | Trustee | 23 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL IAN DUNNINGS | Trustee | 23 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.87k | £31.98k | £26.51k | £69.69k | £187.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.78k | £24.79k | £16.11k | £31.55k | £173.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.00k | £11.00k | £4.27k | £50.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 03/10/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 LEAPHILL ROAD
BOURNEMOUTH
BH7 6LS
- Phone:
- 07970193747
- Email:
- Chairmanvcb@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window