THE HARDMAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of high quality services in supporting older people facing isolation or loneliness and for the parents of pre-school children seeking excellent early years education for their children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Total income includes £108,225 from government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gateshead
Governance
- 12 October 2011: Standard registration
- 26 November 2017: Funds received from 1034165 DENEWELL PLAYGROUP
- HARDMAN CENTRE (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Charlton | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hood | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Cresswell | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Huw Sperring | Trustee | 07 April 2018 |
|
|||||
REV ASIF KARAM M.DIV. | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
William Coates | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Newman | Trustee | 09 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Haygarth | Trustee | 12 October 2011 |
|
|||||
JOAN JOHNSON | Trustee | 15 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £354.83k | £267.26k | £273.85k | £303.78k | £382.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £283.27k | £275.21k | £279.51k | £296.95k | £321.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £117.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £117.00k | £0 | £108.23k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/04/2011
Charitable objects
1) TO TAKE OVER ALL THE ASSETS AND UNDERTAKINGS OF THE HARDMAN CENTRE, AN UNICORPORATED ASSOCIATION BASED AT DRYDEN ROAD, GATESHEAD, TYNE & WEAR, NE9 5HP (THE CENTRE) 2) TO BENEFIT THE COMMUNITY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A DAY CARE FACILITY FOR OLDER PEOPLE IN THE GATESHEAD REGION OF TYNE AND WEAR (THE REGION) AND IN PARTICULAR: A) TO HELP PREVENT THE ISOLATION OF OLDER PEOPLE BY PROVIDING TRANSPORT TO AND A VENUE FOR SOCIAL INTERACTION B) TO PROVIDE ACTIVITIES AND AMENITIES TO ASSIST MENTAL STIMULATION C) TO GIVE THE CARERS OF OLDER PEOPLE RESPITE TIME D) TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE AMONG OLDER PEOPLE BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR TRIPS TO LOCAL ATTRACTIONS AND THEATRES E) TO ASSIST IN THE SOCIAL INTEGRATION OF GROUPS WHO MAY BE ISOLATED DUE TO PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITIES 2) TO BENEFIT THE COMMUNITY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A PRE-SCHOOL GROUP, AND IN PARTICULAR A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY PROVIDING DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES FOR CHILDREN B) TO ENCOURAGE THE EARLY DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN TO ENSURE A SMOOTH TRANSITION INTO FULL TIME EDUCATION C) TO PROVIDE A SOCIAL EXAMPLE TO CHILDREN IN ORDER TO ENCOURAGE THEM TO INTERACT WITH EACH OTHER AND WITH ADULTS IN A POSITIVE MANNER 3) TO AID THE EXPRESSION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY MEETING THE NEEDS OF THE AREA IN WHICH THE CHAIRITY IS SITUATED, INCLUDING BY MEANS OF THE PROVISION OF (FOR EXAMPLE) SUCH SERVICES AS DESCRIBED IN THESE OBJECTS, AND IN PARTICULAR A) TO PROVIDE A CENTRE CHAPLAIN TO SUPPORT CENTRE ATTENDEES AND THEIR FAMILIES IN DIFFICULT TIMES SUACH AS HOSPITAL STAYS OR BEREAVEMENT B) TO PROMOTE THE METHODIST CHURCH BY HOLDING A MONTHLY SERVICE IN THE CENTRE AND TO DO ANYTHING WHICH MAY BE INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO ANY OF THE ABOVE OBKECTS
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 PERCY ROAD
WHITLEY BAY
NE26 2AX
- Phone:
- 01914874248
- Email:
- ianhardmancentre@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window