MIKE CAMPBELL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1144943
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Foundation has been undertaking activities to contribute to the sound administration of human rights law, monitoring human rights abuses and relieving need among the victims of human rights abuses in Zimbabwe and with reference to the SADC Region

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £143,115
Total expenditure: £175,617

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • South Africa
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 December 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • MCF (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PENELOPE CLAIRE FREETH Chair 06 December 2011
None on record
Katherine Julia Ruston Hames Trustee 12 September 2022
None on record
Dr Robert Broughton Ridgway Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record
Luke Charles Hardingham Trustee 08 May 2019
None on record
Jonathan William Webb-Peploe Trustee 08 October 2018
None on record
ROSEMARY ANNE SUMMERFIELD Trustee 12 December 2017
None on record
MAXWELL PERKIN Trustee 10 November 2014
None on record
ELISE MUTALENI ANGULA Trustee 03 August 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £241.06k £159.61k £143.63k £169.19k £143.12k
Total expenditure £226.59k £164.24k £146.87k £168.99k £175.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 05 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 05 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 13 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 13 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 10 September 2023 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 10 September 2023 72 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 23 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Woodgate Farm
Oad Street
Borden
SITTINGBOURNE
ME9 8JX
Phone:
01795842341