TROOPER POTTS VC MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To provide & maintain a memorial in central Reading to Trooper Potts VC, Trooper Andrews the men & women of the Berkshire Yeomanry past, present & future, naming those lost in wars of 20 th C 2. Run workshops for schools, colleges, clubs about lessons from such events.3. Share current activities on Facebook; www.facebook.com/TrooperPottsMemorialTrust, Twitter; www.twitter.com/TrooperPottsVC
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 30 April 2012: Standard registration
- TROOPER POTTS VC TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR Richard Duckett BA,MA,PGCE | Trustee | 06 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD BENNETT | Trustee | 12 March 2012 |
|
|||||
BRIGADIER MICHAEL ANTHONY ARIS CBE DL | Trustee | 12 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MARTINA AMES | Trustee | 12 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MILES CHAPMAN BSC | Trustee | 12 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £484 | £375 | £132 | £239 | £444 | |
|
Total expenditure | £456 | £677 | £449 | £283 | £309 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/11/2011 AS AMENDED ON 20/04/2012
Charitable objects
1.TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A MONUMENT IN CENTRAL READING TO COMMEMORATE THE ACHIEVEMNETS OF THE BERKSHIRE YEOMANRY,PAST AND PRESENT,AND IN PARTICULAR TROOPER POTTS VC AND TROOPER ANDREWS AND TO COMMEMORATE THE 134 MEN OF THE BERKSHIRE YEOMANRY LOST IN WW1. 2.TO ASSIST PERSONS WHO ARE CURRENTLY SERVING OR WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE ARMED FORCES,AND THEIR DEPENDANTS BY ADVANCING ANY PURPOSE THAT IS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO THE CHARITY KNOWN AS HELP THE HEROES. 3.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE EVENTS DURING 1914-18 WITHIN THE UK AND OVERSEAS, AND ABOUT SUCH DEEDS, COMRADESHIP, THEIR SETTING, IMPLICATIONS AND RELEVANCE TODAY, WITH PARTICULAR FOCUS ON THE ACTIONS OF THE BERKSHIRE YEOMANARY, PAST AND PRESENT. 4. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF SCULPTURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
69 BAKER STREET
READING
RG1 7XY
- Phone:
- 07802763289
- Email:
- bennettbaker@msn.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window