SOFT TOUCH ARTS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide opportunities for young people whose life circumstances put them at a disadvantage to engage in creative projects to support their personal development & achievement of their ambitions: running a varied programme of arts, music & cooking activities, from group sessions to one to one support & supporting community capacity building. We also work with adult prisoners and asylum seekers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£706,715
Donations and legacies | £10.16k | |
Charitable activities | £672.40k | |
Other trading activities | £9.63k | |
Investments | £10.39k | |
Other | £4.13k |
Total expenditure:
£724,889
Raising funds | £37.61k | |
Charitable activities | £687.28k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £7,810 from 3 government contract(s) and £22,690 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £37.61k | |
Charitable expenditure | £687.28k |
People

24 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 18 May 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shami Doshi | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan West | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Danny Myers | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Grace | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Craig Stocker | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Saahera Mahomed | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicol Siobhan Nightingale | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Michael Hudson | Trustee | 22 March 2012 |
|
|||||
Joe Crofton | Trustee | 22 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
VINCENT JOHN ATTWOOD | Trustee | 22 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £524.52k | £690.52k | £701.30k | £601.63k | £706.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £600.38k | £519.35k | £594.95k | £705.28k | £724.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £67.54k | £52.76k | £20.90k | £9.10k | £7.81k | |
|
Income from government grants | £176.02k | £295.77k | £360.11k | £273.44k | £22.69k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £23.54k | £186.02k | £71.54k | £7.35k | £10.16k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £22.25k | £20.60k | £11.02k | £7.36k | £9.63k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £461.55k | £473.84k | £606.90k | £573.93k | £672.40k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £12.10k | £5.39k | £9.75k | £8.78k | £10.39k | |
|
Income - Other | £5.09k | £4.67k | £2.09k | £4.21k | £4.13k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £568.88k | £408.75k | £548.67k | £657.25k | £687.28k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £31.51k | £31.56k | £44.75k | £44.08k | £37.61k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £57.20k | £51.07k | £71.86k | £51.42k | £48.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £79.03k | £1.54k | £3.95k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.13m | £1.11m | £1.09m | £1.06m | £1.05m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £310.48k | £509.55k | £602.16k | £532.55k | £536.12k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £208.03k | £208.15k | £175.45k | £182.92k | £170.87k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/10/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01/12/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/03/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/02/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/02/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/12/2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24/04/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE AS FOLLOWS: A. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION AND PRACTICE OF THE ARTS. B. TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR THOSE WHO ARE MOST DISADVANTAGED IN SOCIETY BY WAY OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION, MENTAL AND PHYSICAL DISABILITY AND VULNERABLE PHYSICAL CIRCUMSTANCE, SUCH AS BEING IN CARE OR HOMELESS, THROUGH PARTICIPATION IN THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE CREATION OF MUSIC, FILM AND VIDEO, MULTI MEDIA INSTALLATIONS, SCULPTURE, DRAMA AND GRAPHIC DESIGNS. C. TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF SKILLS AND APTITUDES SUCH AS CREATIVE EXPRESSION, SELF CONFIDENCE, GROUP WORKING AND COMMUNICATION THROUGH PARTICIPATION IN THE ARTS. D. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: I. THE PROVISION OF ARTS AND MEDIA ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; II. PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. E. TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH ARTS, TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES SO THAT THEY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. F. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS MEANS OF: I. ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE; II. ADVANCING EDUCATION; III. RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; AND IV. PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. G. AND TO CARRY OUT ALL OTHER SUCH WORK INCIDENTAL TO THE ABOVE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LEICESTER, LEICESTERSHIRE, EAST MIDLANDS AND OCCASIONALLY IN OTHER AREAS OF THE UK TO SHARE GOOD PRACTICE OR REPLICATE MODELS OF DELIVERY.
Area of benefit
LEICESTER, LEICESTERSHIRE, EAST MIDLANDS AND OCCASIONALLY IN OTHER AREAS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 New Walk
LEICESTER
LE1 6TF
- Phone:
- 01162552592
- Email:
- info@soft-touch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window