THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CHAD, HANDFORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Church which is part of the Church of England. Provision of public worship; sacred space; pastoral work; teaching of Christianity; Youth and children's work; promotion of Christianity through events and meetings; promoting mission of the Church through activities with various sections of the local community; provision of a Community Cafe; supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 18 October 2012: Previously excepted registration
- ST CHAD'S PCC, HANDFORTH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Burmester | Chair | 16 October 2012 |
|
|||||
Simon David Heal | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Grange | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Janet Brown | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Margery Gilbert | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Richard John Reeve | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Morrison | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Barnes | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Avril Esther Elizabeth Allen | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jim Lethbridge | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachel McDowell | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Gilbert | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS BIRCH | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.18k | £120.52k | £144.98k | £166.33k | £158.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.83k | £177.85k | £137.43k | £150.59k | £169.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Chads C of E Church
Wilmslow Road
Handforth
Wilmslow
SK9 3ES
- Phone:
- 01625532145
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window