BELCEA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1150194
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust awards money to composers who compose works for the Belcea Quartet to perform internationally. The Trust also awards money to Belcea Quartet members who mentor younger upcoming chamber groups in intensive coaching sessions.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £800
Total expenditure: £2,981

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 December 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT BOAS Chair 09 November 2012
FITZFEST
Received: 2 days late
Music at Plush Ltd
Received: 41 days late
Jason Thomas Price Trustee 03 June 2021
None on record
GRAHAM NICHOLSON Trustee 27 October 2017
None on record
Sally Walton Trustee 14 December 2015
THE FRIENDS OF ST BARTHOLOMEW'S CHURCH, ORFORD
Received: On time
Jennifer Susan Jonas Trustee 01 January 2015
MORABE RURAL MUSIC
Recently registered
THE IMOGEN COOPER MUSIC TRUST
Received: On time
SIR JOHN TUSA Trustee 09 November 2012
KATHLEEN FERRIER MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
THE INTERNATIONAL YOUTH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DAME JANET RITTERMAN DBE Trustee 09 November 2012
None on record
SABINE VINCK Trustee 09 November 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.77k £3.17k £850 £1.03k £800
Total expenditure £9.35k £2.96k £90 £2.03k £2.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
48 Carrington Crescent
Wendover
Aylesbury
HP22 6AN
Phone:
07812984236