THE CREATIVE ARTS RETREAT MOVEMENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing and training leaders for about 30 retreats, mainly in England
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- CARM (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.60k | £9.70k | £8.31k | £8.01k | £4.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.87k | £10.92k | £7.41k | £6.73k | £2.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 07 April 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 NOV 2011 as amended on 10 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
3.1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE BRITISH ISLES AND ELSEWHERE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE FACILITATION AND HOLDING OF RETREATS, PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, WORKSHOPS AND OTHER EVENTS, AND THE PRODUCTION OF LITERATURE AND OTHER MEDIA ENABLING THE PUBLIC TO EXPERIENCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH CREATIVITY AND THE ARTS; AND TO PROVIDE BURSARIES TO ENABLE PEOPLE TO ATTEND SUCH RETREATS AND OTHER EVENTS WHO WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE ABLE SO TO DO. 3.2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECTS OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE ARTS, AND THEIR RELATION TO ONE ANOTHER. 3.3. TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY EXPLORATION, MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS.
Area of benefit
BRITISH ISLES AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window