STRATFORD ON AVON METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of regular acts of worship open to members of the church and non-members alike. The provision of sacred space (the building ) for prayer and contemplation. We reach out to our local community with activities engaging mothers and toddlers, children's choir, fellowship through brunches and friendship lunches, holiday at home initiative addressing needs of the elderly and lonely
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

19 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 06 June 2013: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Paul Peacop | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Steele | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Rosina Margaret Blakemore | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Phillip Neil Ledgard | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM ALAN CUMMING | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Brown | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Janet Veronica Grant | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Rimmer | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mee | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham Neville Collins | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LESLIE DUMPER | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|||||
MALCOLM DAVID SMITH | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR LIM CHUEN HO | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN AMY EDWARDS B.ED | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA JEAN BIRNIE BA HONS | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
EVELYN MAY HO | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN LOADER | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BRIERLEY LEDGARD | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Jane Elizabeth Mills | Trustee | 01 September 2002 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.33k | £55.02k | £87.37k | £101.64k | £135.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.84k | £78.05k | £94.06k | £99.89k | £127.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
99 SHOTTERY ROAD
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
WARWICKSHIRE
99 SHOTTERY ROAD
CV37 9QB
- Phone:
- 01789550193
- Email:
- david.dumper@ntlworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window