Parkgate Society

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ILLUSTRATED TALKS ON TOPICS OF INTEREST TO MEMBERS DISCUSSION WITH LOCAL AUTHORITY ON CONSERVATION AND PLANNING ISSUES PROMOTING THE PARKGATE CONSERVATION AREA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 11 November 1974: Standard registration
- PARKGATE SOCIETY (Working name)
- PARKGATE AND DISTRICT SOCIETY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bryan Lecky | Chair | 11 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Richard Toomey | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marple Brenda Melissa | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JAMES MARSHALL | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Thompson | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Walter Frederick Cotton | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Enevoldson | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Derek Haylock | Trustee | 06 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALAN PASSMORE | Trustee | 19 April 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £1.62k | £3.55k | £2.79k | £4.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.86k | £798 | £3.75k | £1.79k | £5.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JANUARY 1974 AS AMENDED 20 OCTOBER 2008 as amended on 10 Oct 2022 as amended on 10 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
(A) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (B) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (C) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF BUILDINGS AND FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
PARKGATE AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Woodlands Road
Parkgate
Neston
CH64 6RT
- Phone:
- 01513362917
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window