Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST DUNSTAN, MONKS RISBOROUGH
Charity number: 1153869

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Peter James Howard Godden | Chair | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Arthur Kent | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Simon Geoffrey Trower FRCGP | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|||||
David Alexander Curry Dr | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Elizabeth Prendergast | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Maycock Mrs | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Marie Burke | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles Robert Fairall | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Nott | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL WOODWARD-COURT | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|||||
ANGELINE VERE | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEBBIE NORIE | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARY INGRAM | Trustee | 29 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Jane Louise Elizabeth Curry MA | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANE ROGERS | Trustee | 08 September 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.