BOLTON FIRST CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly worship services, prayer and Bible study, house groups, chats and crafts for all ages. Christmas Carol services, Easter celebrations, Remembrance Sunday. Choirs for all ages. Community events for children and young people such as 'The Island', Friday Youth Group, Allsorts, Connect. Kindertots - parent and toddler group. Prime Time events for over 55's. Weekly Open Door Cafe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bolton
Governance
- 24 July 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV SUSAN AVEYARD | Chair | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev Erica Tuxworth | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Masoka Omari Baleebenga | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Schofield | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carys Hannah Barnes | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Barnes | Trustee | 23 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN DAVID BARNES | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN HULME | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER FRANCIS BARNES | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200.18k | £204.97k | £162.34k | £200.01k | £40.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £174.22k | £194.47k | £180.96k | £188.07k | £74.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 24 Jul 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS PART OF THE INTERNATIONAL CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE AND THE DISTRICT PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN NORTHERN ENGLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE
SOUTHEND STREET
BOLTON
BL3 3PU
- Phone:
- 07773250047
- Email:
- bolton1cio@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window