Broughton House - Veteran Care Village

Charity number: 1155225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide accommodation, care and support for military veterans who have served in the British Armed Forces, Merchant Navy and their spouse or civil partner. If there are vacancies within Broughton House the Charity Trustees can admit other persons who are in need of care and support.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Salford City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 January 2014: CIO registration
  • 15 May 2020: Funds received from 227864 BROUGHTON HOUSE HOME FOR EX-SERVICE PERSONNEL
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • BROUGHTON HOUSE (Working name)
  • BROUGHTON HOUSE - HOME FOR EX-SERVICE MEN AND WOMEN (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Councillor Tracy Kelly Trustee 21 January 2025
None on record
Robert Manuel Trustee 19 November 2024
None on record
Neil Clark Trustee 19 November 2024
None on record
Peter James Curtis Trustee 22 June 2021
None on record
Sharon Stewart Trustee 11 August 2020
None on record
Commodore Phillip Waterhouse Trustee 09 June 2020
None on record
Colonel Russell Miller Trustee 09 October 2018
None on record
COLONEL P LOYNES Trustee 23 December 2013
DRILL HALL CHARITY AT STRETFORD ROAD, MANCHESTER
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.90m £2.60m £3.15m £2.15m £4.50m
Total expenditure £2.36m £2.51m £2.32m £3.15m £4.01m
Income from government contracts £730.75k £634.31k £599.47k £1.14m £1.90m
Income from government grants N/A £188.04k £99.34k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.96m £1.71m £2.25m £507.98k £388.53k
Income - Other trading activities £1.43k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £912.07k £867.30k £904.31k £1.64m £3.24m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £21.00k £14.78k £2.58k £3.92k £4.62k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £859.80k
Income - Legacies £287.09k £1.00k £40.25k £0 £57.06k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.24m £2.38m £2.24m £3.07m £3.98m
Expenditure - Raising funds £114.26k £129.32k £80.08k £81.75k £25.41k
Expenditure - Governance £15.06k £12.29k £16.99k £15.60k £27.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £8.11k £7.79k £1.29k £2.21k £2.19k
Expenditure - Other £1.22k £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £7.43m £9.96m £12.68m £12.38m £11.92m
Long-term investments £589.77k £265.77k £187.16k £173.78k £192.00k
Other assets £214.48k £1.62m £415.61k £322.45k £591.32k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £646.20k £4.03m £4.62m £5.23m £4.56m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 03 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 16 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Broughton House
- Veteran Care Village
Park Lane
Salford
Greater Manchester
M7 4JD
Phone:
01617402737