ST JOHN'S COMMON ROOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the interests and welfare of Students at St John's College during their course of study and representing, supporting and advising students. Being the recognised channel between Students and St John's College and any external bodies. Providing social, cultural, sporting and recreational activities and forums for discussions and debate for the personal development of its students.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Durham
Governance
- 04 February 2014: Standard registration
- ST JOHN'S COLLEGE JCR (Working name)
- JOHN'S COMMON ROOM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Matthew Gomulak | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Martin John Hodgetts | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Savine | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Grace Martin | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Oliver William John Davis | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Edwin John Jermyn-Francis | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Katherine Amy Hickson | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Susannah Ruth Curtis | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.08k | £52.56k | £91.79k | £172.14k | £120.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.78k | £43.58k | £80.90k | £196.52k | £122.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2024
(These accounts |
10 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 February 2022 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 February 2022 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 FEB 2013 AS AMENDED ON 07 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
THE JCRS CHARITABLE OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT ST JOHNS COLLEGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: - PROMOTING THE INTERESTS AND WELFARE OF STUDENTS AT ST JOHNS COLLEGE DURING THEIR COURSE OF STUDY AND REPRESENTING, SUPPORTING AND ADVISING STUDENTS; - BEING THE RECOGNISED REPRESENTATIVE CHANNEL BETWEEN STUDENTS AND ST JOHNS COLLEGE AND ANY OTHER EXTERNAL BODIES; AND - PROVIDING SOCIAL, CULTURAL, SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FORUMS FOR DISCUSSIONS AND DEBATE FOR THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF ITS STUDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. JOHNS COLLEGE
3 SOUTH BAILEY
DURHAM
DH1 3RJ
- Phone:
- 07557355665
- Email:
- sjcr@durham.ac.uk
- Website:
-
stjohnscommonroom.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window