FAI - ITALIAN HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Objects are :a) to promote the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment in Italy; b) the advancement of heritage in Italy; c) the advancement of education of the public in the heritage in Italy; in particular (but without limitation) by supporting the charitable purposes of the Italian organization Fondo per l'Ambiente Italiano.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 December 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM HENRY MARCELLO PARENTE | Chair | 20 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Stefano Ferraiolo | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria de Peverelli | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
elisabetta scopinich | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
giacomo balsamo | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CATRIN ELISABETH MELOR TREADWELL | Trustee | 09 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.41k | £25.05k | £40.61k | £12.23k | £17.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.78k | £28.80k | £6.93k | £17.93k | £12.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 February 2023 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 February 2023 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 MAR 2012 as amended on 13 Feb 2019 as amended on 03 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (A) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN ITALY; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HERITAGE IN ITALY BY: (I) THE PROMOTION OF THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR PLACES OF NATIONAL OR HISTORIC INTEREST OR ARCHITECTURAL, CULTURAL OR ARTISTIC MERIT, AND THEIR SURROUNDINGS; (II) THE PRESERVATION OF FURNITURE, PICTURES AND OTHER CHATTELS OF ANY DESCRIPTION HAVING NATIONAL, CULTURAL, HISTORIC OR ARTISTIC INTEREST; AND (III) SUPPORTING THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC ACCESS TO SUCH BUILDINGS, PLACES AND CHATTELS; AND (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HERITAGE IN ITALY AND THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN ITALY, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY SUPPORTING THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE ITALIAN ORGANISATION FONDO PER L'AMBIENTE ITALIANO.
Area of benefit
ITALY
Contact information
- Address:
-
B & A Partners
38 Craven Street
LONDON
WC2N 5NG
- Phone:
- 07951594481
- Email:
- info@faiuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window