PROJECT EQUINOX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
During the period 01 August 2014 to 31 July 2015 this charity has been involved in partnership and site acquisition, project planning and research activity only.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 November 2014: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof. Christopher Terence Lewis MBE FRCS | Chair | 01 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Laura Bowater MBE | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neah Jayne Boniface | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Major General Richard John Cantrill OBE MC RM | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Tillman BEng MSc | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
DENIS WILKINS MD FRCS | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.60k | £45.00k | £0 | £1.60k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.17k | £15.50k | £9.10k | £9.19k | £5.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 07 Nov 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE:- 1) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONGST PEOPLE AT RISK OF SOCIAL EXCLUSION BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, DISABILITY, ILL HEALTH OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, IN PARTICULAR, AMONGST VETERANS OF THE ARMED FORCES (OR OF THE MERCHANT NAVY WHO HAVE SERVED IN BRITISH MILITARY OPERATIONS), BY THE PROVISION OF LONG TERM HOUSING FOR SUCH PERSONS AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR ACTIVITIES AND INTERACTION WITH PERSONS OF A DIFFERENT DEMOGRAPHIC, IN PARTICULAR, STUDENTS FROM PLYMOUTH UNIVERSITY; AND 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING:- (A) BY ENABLING STUDENTS TO DEVELOP SKILLS AND EXPERIENCE RELEVANT TO THEIR STUDIES; AND (B) BY PUBLISHING THE RESULTS OF RESEARCH WITH A VIEW TO INFORMING AND ENHANCING GOOD PRACTICE IN MEETING THE NEEDS OF PERSONS IN CHARITABLE NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Abbotswood Tax & Accountancy
Trevear House
Old County Court
Alverton Terrace
PENZANCE
TR18 4GH
- Phone:
- 01736 363202
- Email:
- projectequinox@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window