COMMUNITY UNITY (LEEDS) CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Community Unity (Leeds) CIO current activities are delivering hampers and toys at Christmas, running community family parties (Halloween and Christmas) and providing weekly meals and support to vulnerable local people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 07 July 2014: CIO registration
- COMMUNITY UNITY (LEEDS) (Previous name)
- COMMUNITY UNITY (LEEDS)CIO (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karl Matthew Footitt | Chair | 30 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ann Mary Lamprell | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Thewlis | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Brennan | Trustee | 30 March 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.77k | £11.90k | £3.00k | £8.46k | £14.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.14k | £8.53k | £5.33k | £7.79k | £12.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.20k | £690 | £300 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 07 Jul 2014 as amended on 05 Jan 2019 as amended on 16 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
1. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY OF RICHMOND HILL, CROSS GREEN AND EAST END PARK IN THE WARD OF BURMANTOFTS AND RICHMOND HILL IN THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF LEEDS IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. 2. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. 3. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED. 4. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Westway
Garforth
LEEDS
LS25 1DB
- Phone:
- 07913665606
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window