THE PERSHORE RIVERSIDE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a youth centre and facilities for helping and educating boys and girls resident in Pershore and the neighbourhood, through leisure time activities so to develop their physical, mental and spiritual capabilities that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and as members of society and that their conditions of life may be improved.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £23,650 from 1 government contract(s) and £54,207 from 5 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 27 March 2014: CIO registration
- 27 May 2015: Funds received from 1042546 PERSHORE RIVERSIDE YOUTH CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITT...
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zoe Louise Budding | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Christopher Cusson | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Turier | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daniel Douglas Boatright-Greene | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Thornton | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Christmas | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann Draper | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev CLAIRE LORDING | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|||||
David Greer LLB | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Boyns Tucker | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.95k | £85.22k | £89.54k | £104.89k | £128.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.39k | £70.73k | £90.93k | £103.77k | £129.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.27k | £23.65k | |
|
Income from government grants | £36.58k | £69.02k | £65.94k | £66.66k | £54.21k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Mar 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A YOUTH CENTRE AND FACILITIES TO HELP AND EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE RESIDENT IN PERSHORE AND IT?S NEIGHBOURHOOD, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY) THE PROVISION OF PADDLESPORT ACTIVITIES, SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pershore Riverside Centre
King Georges Way
PERSHORE
Worcestershire
WR10 1QU
- Phone:
- 01386554713
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window