Artizan International

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Running craft workshops for people with disabilities (PWDs) to learn craft skills. 2. Training skilled volunteers to set up employment-generating craft workshops for PWDs facing poverty in the developing world. 3. Running a shop to sell products made by PWDs in our workshops in the developing world to provide them with an income. 4. Running a cafe to provide day services & work experience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£515,880
Donations and legacies | £206.80k | |
Charitable activities | £298.38k | |
Other trading activities | £6.94k | |
Investments | £3.77k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£587,786
Raising funds | £10.54k | |
Charitable activities | £577.25k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £10.54k | |
Charitable expenditure | £577.25k |
People

14 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
- Ecuador
- Peru
Governance
- 13 February 2015: CIO registration
- Artizan International (Working name)
- CRAFT AID INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD HALL MBLLB, | Chair | 08 November 2012 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Elizabeth Sewell BA BSc | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Serenity Stewart BA | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Neil Paul BA, FCA | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Lisette Meadows Robinson BA, ACCA | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Alan Garrow | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Steve Howell | Trustee | 08 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Deanne Howell | Trustee | 08 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £216.16k | £322.90k | £326.32k | £727.37k | £515.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £174.51k | £434.76k | £262.95k | £521.26k | £587.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £19.76k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £364.97k | £206.80k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £6.94k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £362.33k | £298.38k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £73 | £3.77k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £521.26k | £577.25k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £10.54k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £71.26k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £200.00k | £200.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £380.96k | £316.65k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.47k | £24.06k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 13 Feb 2015 as amended on 04 Jul 2019 as amended on 24 Dec 2020 as amended on 30 May 2022
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are: 1. To relieve the needs of disabled people in Yorkshire and the surrounding area by providing opportunities to engage in socially interactive craft-based activities and to learn craft-based skills. 2. The relief of poverty among disabled people in such parts of the world as the trustees shall from time to time determine in particular but not exclusively through the provision of training in craft-based skills and the establishment of craft-based social enterprise organisations to provide training and employment opportunities for such people. 3. The promotion of social inclusion for the public benefit amongst people with disabilities.
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Oxford Street
HARROGATE
North Yorkshire
HG11PW
- Phone:
- 07588 724142
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window