STAREHE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In 2016 this charity replaced Starehe UK (1035323), a charitable trust formed in 1994. It supports Starehe Boys' Centre & School (founded 1959) and Starehe Girls' School (founded 2005), which provide free secondary education for promising but poor children from all over Kenya, and emphasise the importance of service and leadership. Annual Reports of the former charity are at http://bit.ly/2b2lSJV
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kenya
Governance
- 01 August 2014: CIO registration
- 30 June 2016: Funds received from 1035323 STAREHE UK
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID KISIAKY | Chair | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Neil Andrew Scotney | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr John F Kibugi | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Festus Maseki | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vane Moraa Aminga | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine McKibbin | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
HELEN VARMA | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
KEITH GRANVILLE PRICE | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARK WEBB | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
TIM FAITHFULL | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
LORD VALENTINE CECIL | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL CHAPPLE WHITEHOUSE | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.05k | £103.79k | £148.80k | £94.21k | £87.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.26k | £128.83k | £235.12k | £128.88k | £142.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 01 Aug 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) THE FURTHERANCE OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT STAREHE BOYS' CENTRE AND SCHOOL AND STAREHE GIRLS' CENTRE AND SCHOOL IN KENYA BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS FOR SUCH CAPITAL OR INCOME EXPENSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF BURSARIES AND SCHOLARSHIPS TO FUND THE EDUCATION AT STAREHE BOYS' CENTRE AND SCHOOL AND STAREHE GIRLS' CENTRE AND SCHOOL OF POOR OR ORPHANED CHILDREN, AND (2) THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Printworks
77 High Street
BRIDGNORTH
Shropshire
WV16 4DX
- Phone:
- 07920 867450
- Email:
- admin@starehe.org
- Website:
-
starehe.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window