MARTIN PARR FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education in the arts, in particular the art of photography, by the establishment and maintenance of a gallery and library of documentary photography books and photographs, in particular but not by way of limitation, of the work of Martin Parr
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 15 April 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aaron Zachary Schuman | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ricketts | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Song Tae Chong | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Elizabeth Parker | Trustee | 31 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN PARR | Trustee | 28 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELLEN PARR | Trustee | 28 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr SUSAN PHILLIPA PARR | Trustee | 28 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £673.54k | £569.17k | £355.90k | £501.01k | £467.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £330.62k | £231.12k | £263.02k | £288.45k | £334.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £519.25k | £508.89k | N/A | £315.26k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £126.69k | £18.51k | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £25.89k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £27.60k | £41.77k | N/A | £45.18k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £114.68k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £236.42k | £165.96k | N/A | £237.09k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £66.04k | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.56k | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £28.16k | £65.16k | N/A | £51.35k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/04/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF PHOTOGRAPHY, BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A GALLERY AND A LIBRARY OF DOCUMENTARY PHOTOGRAPHY BOOKS AND PHOTOGRAPHS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION, OF THE WORK OF MARTIN PARR.
Contact information
- Address:
-
316 Paintworks
Arnos Vale
Bristol
BS4 3AR
- Phone:
- 0117 329 3270
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window