ILKESTON CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE

Charity number: 1160331
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sunday Morning Church service at 10.45am Stay and Play sessions on a Thursday and Friday Morning for Local families with under 5's. 9.30AM-11.30AM We provide support and signposting for those suffering with mental health issues.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022

Total income: £14,513
Total expenditure: £23,373

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Religious Activities
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 February 2015: CIO registration
  • 20 February 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 20 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1133336 CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE BRITISH ISLES SOUTH DISTRIC...
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £182.67k £18.37k £14.50k £11.92k £14.51k
Total expenditure £57.49k £13.97k £13.10k £136.23k £23.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2022 22 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 22 May 2023 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2021 12 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 12 July 2022 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2020 21 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 21 June 2021 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2019 31 July 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 31 July 2020 1 days late