SUSSEX BADGER VACCINATION PROJECT LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sussex Badger Vaccination Project vaccinate badgers against bovine tuberculosis in Sussex.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 16 September 2015: Standard registration
- 15 July 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 15 July 2024: Funds transferred to 1108880 EAST SUSSEX WRAS LTD
- SUSSEX BADGER VACCINATION PROJECT (Previous name)
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.61k | £2.01k | £251 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.36k | £1.21k | £2.72k | £839 | £5.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 27 June 2024 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 JUN 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/09/2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO RELIEVE AND PREVENT SUFFERING IN BADGERS BY PROVIDING VETERINARY CARE AND TREATMENT IN THE FORM OF VACCINATION AGAINST BOVINE TUBERCULOSIS IN EAST SUSSEX AND PROMOTING THIS HUMANE APPROACH TO REDUCING BOVINE TUBERCULOSIS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window