HALL GREEN UNITED COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian Church Community Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 09 June 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mark Richard Meatcher | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hyacinth Sutton | Trustee | 19 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Anne Kesseler | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil David Walker | Trustee | 24 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Pamela Smith | Trustee | 25 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Valerie Gillian Dickens | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAN CHARLES PERKINS | Trustee | 24 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN DICKENS | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Julia Parkes | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Saffron Parkes | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Linda Ramdharry | Trustee | 02 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
NORMA ICILMA MAYNARD | Trustee | 02 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Blair Edward Kesseler | Trustee | 03 October 2016 |
|
|||||
KEITH DENNIS | Trustee | 26 June 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.11k | £101.68k | £121.49k | £110.49k | £159.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.11k | £136.73k | £139.91k | £139.17k | £108.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 OCT 2014
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING CHURCHES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 BARN LANE
MOSELEY
BIRMINGHAM
B13 0SN
- Phone:
- 01216897499
- Email:
- info@HGUCC.org.uk
- Website:
-
HGUCC.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window