SPECIAL YOGA FOUNDATION CIO
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Special Yoga Foundation focuses on bringing yoga to special needs children.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2019
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Llundain Fwyaf
Llywodraethu
- 12 Tachwedd 2021: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1137695 ICANDANCE
- 02 Medi 2015: CIO registration
- 12 Tachwedd 2021: Tynnwyd (DILEU AR GAIS)
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £458.97k | £263.15k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £423.09k | £283.17k | £15.86k | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 21 Hydref 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 21 Hydref 2020 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | 20 Hydref 2020 | 355 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | 20 Hydref 2020 | 355 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | 24 Ebrill 2019 | 175 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | 24 Ebrill 2019 | 175 diwrnod yn hwyr |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - Foundation Registered 02 Sep 2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: A. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN YOGA AND OTHER COMPLIMENTARY THERAPIES, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) TO ENCOURAGE THE TEACHING OF YOGA AND OTHER COMPLIMENTARY THERAPIES IN SCHOOLS, DAY-CARE CENTRES, ORPHANAGES AND IN CENTRES CARING FOR THOSE WITH PHYSICAL AND MENTAL DISABILITIES; B. TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR YOGA; C. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL AND PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR YOGA AND OTHER COMPLIMENTARY THERAPIES TO THOSE PERSONS AND FAMILIES AND BY PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH BENEFITS OF YOGA AND COMPLIMENTARY THERAPIES AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH; (2) FOR THE PURPOSES OF SUB-CLAUSE (1), “COMPLIMENTARY THERAPIES” SHALL INCLUDE SUCH COMPLEMENTARY THERAPY FALLING WITHIN GROUPS 1 AND 2 OF THE THERAPIES ORIGINALLY DEFINED BY THE HOUSE OF LORDS SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY COMMITTEE REPORT ON COMPLEMENTARY AND ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE (SEE ANNEX A) OR ANY SUCH OTHER COMPLEMENTARY THERAPY WHICH THE CHARITY COMMISSION ACCEPTS AS BEING CHARITABLE, AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM APPROPRIATE AND ARE CARRIED OUT IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHARITY LAW.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window