PENTRICH & SOUTH WINGFIELD REVOLUTION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To educate and promote the Pentrich Rising of 1817. To commemorate the bi-centenary in 2017. To continue promoting the cause with exhibitions, talks, books and paintings. To produce educational materials for schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 May 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICK CUTHBERT COOK | Chair | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Matthews | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Colin Ross | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Neuhaus Dr | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|||||
DAVID ALAN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 29 July 2016 |
|
|||||
SYLVIA MASON | Trustee | 29 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE MARY HERBERT | Trustee | 29 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROGER NEIL TANNER | Trustee | 29 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Herbert | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.83k | £1.68k | £771 | £985 | £2.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.99k | £1.18k | £1.12k | £1.65k | £1.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £700 | £900 | N/A | £100 | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 June 2024 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 May 2016 as amended on 30 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: (1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF THE PENTRICH REVOLUTION OF 1817 IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: (A) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE EVENT AND ITS POSITION IN LOCAL, REGIONAL, CONSTITUTIONAL AND NATIONAL 19TH CENTURY HISTORY; (B) ORGANISING ACADEMIC CONFERENCES; (C) THE AID, ESTABLISHMENT, FUNDING, OR SPONSORSHIP OF BURSARIES, SCHOLARSHIPS OR GRANTS TO ANY PERSON OR PERSONS, INSTITUTION, ASSOCIATION OR CORPORATE BODY FOR THE PURPOSE OF FURTHERING UNDERSTANDING OF THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY; (D) THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A PERMANENT EXHIBITION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AT DERBY MUSEUM OR ANOTHER SUITABLE LOCATION; (E) ENHANCING AND EXTENDING EXISTING DISPLAY MATERIAL IN ORDER TO PRODUCE QUALITY FIXED AND MOBILE DISPLAYS; (F) DEVISING A SERIES OF "REVOLUTION" WALKS ALONG THE ROUTE OF THE ORIGINAL MARCH TO INCLUDE HIGH QUALITY WRITTEN ?TRAILS? TO SUPPORT WALKERS; (G) CREATING PERMANENT "INFORMATION SITE" BOARDS ALONG THE ROUTE; (H) ORGANISING EXHIBITIONS OF MATERIAL IN THE LOCALITY OF THE ROUTE AND ELSEWHERE; (I) COMMISSIONING PLAYS, PERFORMANCES AND OTHER DRAMATIC PRESENTATIONS OF THE EVENTS SURROUNDING THE REVOLUTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
245 SLEETMOOR LANE
SWANWICK
ALFRETON
DE55 1RH
- Phone:
- 01773605190
- Email:
- valerie.mherbert@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window