WORCESTER NEWS AND EQUIPMENT SERVICE FOR THE BLIND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides a weekly 90 minute tape cassette of local news to blind and partially sighted people in and around Worcester, all completely free of cost. We also provide a talking book literary service all free. Tape players are provided free on request.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 06 October 1977: Standard registration
- 24 September 2020: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 24 September 2020: Funds transferred to 1180242 WORCESTER NEWS AND EQUIPMENT SERVICES FOR THE BLIN...
- TALKING NEWSPAPER (Working name)
- WORCESTER TALKING NEWSPAPER FOR THE BLIND (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.12k | £792 | £1.98k | £3.23k | £3.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.55k | £9.46k | £7.18k | £15.09k | £5.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 31 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 13 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 30 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 20 SEPTEMBER 1977
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO RELIEVE THE BLIND, OR THE PARTIALLY BLIND, OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING AND WRITING A STRAIN BY THE PROVISION OF: (A) RECORDED TAPES; (B) CASSETTE TAPE-RECORDERS, BRAILLE WRITERS, TYPEWRITERS AND SUCH OTHER MEANS OF COMMUNICATION ON LOAN OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE DETERMINED BY THE COMMITTEE AND (C) ASSISTANCE WITH TELEPHONE INSTALLATION CHARGES AND RENTALS IF SUFFICIENT FUNDS ARE AVAILABLE AFTER THE NEEDS OF (A) AND (B) ABOVE HAVE BEEN MET.
Area of benefit
CITY OF WORCESTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window