ABRIDGE EVANGELICAL FREE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold a weekly Sunday Morning Service. We provide Bible teaching, pastoral support and prayer ministry. In cooperation with the local school, we host and lead their Assemblies. Little Bees, our toddler group, is a meeting place for young mothers and their children. Much of our land is given over to allotments as a service to those who live in the village. We hold some social events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Redbridge
Governance
- 09 December 2015: Standard registration
- AEFC (Working name)
- The Village Church (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Keith John White | Chair | 11 August 1999 |
|
|||||||||
David Kenneth Brewer | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
RICHARD WILLIAM BLACKHURST | Trustee | 02 November 2011 |
|
|||||||||
Rev WILLIAM TURNER | Trustee | 27 March 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.17k | £14.23k | £20.27k | £18.16k | £17.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.45k | £12.50k | £18.66k | £17.91k | £8.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13/10/2014
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN ABRIDGE, ESSEX AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD AND ALSO SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK TO PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE WORK OF THE TRUST
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 CRESCENT ROAD
SOUTH WOODFORD
LONDON
E18 1JB
- Phone:
- 02085042702
- Email:
- keith@millgrove.org.uk
- Website:
-
abridgeevangelicalchurch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window