THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS ALCESTER WARWICKSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities. The provision of public worship, teaching, evangelism and pastoral work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 26 October 2015: Previously excepted registration
- ST NICHOLAS PCC ALCESTER WARWICKSHIRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Florence Ann Wright | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Jane Bayley | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND DANIEL JAMES CORLETT | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Peter Charles Tugwell | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Katie Louise Cross | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Christopher George Wright | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Humphrey | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Neville Titterington | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DEEKS | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JULIE LINDSAY | Trustee | 14 April 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.95k | £90.29k | £117.21k | £123.28k | £154.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.60k | £85.65k | £102.36k | £97.67k | £115.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Nicholas Rectory
Old Rectory Garden
ALCESTER
Warwickshire
B49 5DB
- Phone:
- 01789 764261
- Email:
- rector@alcesterminster.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window