TERRE DES HOMMES UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tdh UK is a member of the global Tdh family, with particularly strong institutional links to Tdh Lausanne, Switzerland, with which it shares the same values and working principles. It funds the humanitarian and development work of the Tdh family worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Albania
- Bangladesh
- Brazil
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Colombia
- Ecuador
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Hungary
- India
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Lebanon
- Mali
- Moldova
- Nepal
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- Panama
- Peru
- Romania
- South Sudan
- Syria
- Togo
- Ukraine
Governance
- TDH UK (Working name)
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 30/06/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.41k | £60.45k | £75.78k | £463.77k | £383.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.37k | £43.33k | £88.90k | £354.35k | £508.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 28 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 28 October 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 23 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 23 January 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Sep 2016 as amended on 27 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE, OR CATASTROPHE BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; 2. TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND WITH A FOCUS ON THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES BY: (A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; (C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window