FRIENDS OF THE LINCOLN MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund-raising by organising (1) concerts, lectures, walks, outings to exhibitions, museums and galleries, and holidays. Making grants to the museums and art gallery in Lincoln towards acquisitions, conservation and educational projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 15 June 1978: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF THE LINCOLN LIBRARIES, MUSEUM AND ART GALLERIES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor Morris | Chair | 17 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Carey Cowham | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tom Hawkyard | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Thompson | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Richard Wood | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Hutchinson | Trustee | 14 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Simpson | Trustee | 08 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.57k | £8.20k | £5.23k | £10.06k | £23.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.46k | £6.73k | £5.01k | £11.12k | £21.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 November 2020 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 November 2020 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 11 APRIL 1972 AS AMENDED 2 MAY 1984, 4 MAY 1999, 3 MAY 2000 AND 26 APRIL 2006.
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE PUBLIC EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES OF THE MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERY BY PROMOTING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROMOTION OF IMPROVEMENTS IN THE ORGANISATION OF, AND THE SERVICES PROVIDED BY THE MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERY AND GENERALLY IN THE QUALITY OF THE MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERY BY THE PUBLIC AND BY MEANS OF LECTURES, MEETINGS, DISCUSSIONS AND VISITS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THOSE SUBJECTS WHICH ARE OF CONCERN TO THE MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Byron Avenue
LINCOLN
LN2 4DX
- Phone:
- 01476585012
- Email:
- mjrthompson@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
lincolnmuseums.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window